Social Services - Generally (O1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0356 / CH0718Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefits - Grant ApplicationDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0445
    (SB0758 / CH0696)
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State SupplementDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0574Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their ChildrenCharles County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0593 / CH0332
    (SB0022 / CH0331)
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - MembershipDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0746Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0973Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Additions and ExtensionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1162 / CH0079
    (SB0785 / CH0078)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1190
    (SB0894)
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload AnalysisDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1449Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1467Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare ProgramDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1482
    (SB0920)
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather PlanningDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1500Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Safety and Security MeasuresDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1501Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators ProgramDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1502 / CH0312Child Support Enforcement - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0022 / CH0331
    (HB0593 / CH0332)
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - MembershipSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0546Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of RestrictionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0758 / CH0696
    (HB0445)
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State SupplementSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0785 / CH0078
    (HB1162 / CH0079)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0894
    (HB1190)
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - StudySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnFinance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0920
    (HB1482)
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather PlanningSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.