Elderly (O2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0083 / CH0178Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access PointChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0346 / CH0236Innovations in Aging Services Program - Commission on Aging - ResponsibilitiesSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0625Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning SystemsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.