Disabled (O3)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0473 / CH0423
    (SB0562)
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With DisabilitiesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1161 / CH0388Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as EducatorsDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0562
    (HB0473 / CH0423)
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With DisabilitiesSenator PetersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0848Interagency Disabilities Board - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training OversightSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0853 / CH0387Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as EducatorsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.