Disabled (O3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0128 / CH0211State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0256Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period IncreaseDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0448 / CH0132
    (SB0344 / CH0133)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account ClarificationsDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0769 / CH0068
    (SB0216 / CH0067)
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and DutiesDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0971
    (SB0872 / CH0612)
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant ProgramDelegate EbersoleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1613
    (SB0876)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1645Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing IndividualsDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0216 / CH0067
    (HB0769 / CH0068)
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and DutiesSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0344 / CH0133
    (HB0448 / CH0132)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account ClarificationsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0444Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False RepresentationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0872 / CH0612
    (HB0971)
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant ProgramSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0876
    (HB1613)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

June 1, 2017 9:08 A.M.