Disabled (O3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0782 / CH0390
    (SB0550 / CH0391)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – ModificationsDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0944First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1113Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi SyndromeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1206Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - EstablishmentDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1618
    (SB0939)
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0482Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - EstablishmentSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0550 / CH0391
    (HB0782 / CH0390)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – ModificationsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0939
    (HB1618)
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1013First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:10 P.M.