Children (O4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0297
    (SB0332 / CH0002)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014SpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0428 / CH0404Children - Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - EligibilityDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0577
    (SB1018)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0794 / CH0425
    (SB0794)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0904 / CH0621Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and ReportDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1270
    (SB0914)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1276 / CH0332
    (SB0716 / CH0331)
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity ActDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1284
    (SB0685 / CH0190)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care PractitionersDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1307 / CH0451Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of BenefitsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1344Task Force on Preventing Child Sexual AbuseDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1522 / CH0461
    (SB1107)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0332 / CH0002
    (HB0297)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0685 / CH0190
    (HB1284)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care PractitionersSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 190Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0716 / CH0331
    (HB1276 / CH0332)
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity ActSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0794
    (HB0794 / CH0425)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectSenator ReillyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0914
    (HB1270)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1018
    (HB0577)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesSenator ReillyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1107
    (HB1522 / CH0461)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.