Children (O4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0575
    (SB0524)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1031Governor's Office for Children - Let's Play Maryland Pilot ProgramDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing cancelledWays and Means
HB1069
    (SB0677 / CH0377)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanDelegate RosenbergVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0524
    (HB0575)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0567 / CH0366
    (HB0643)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0677 / CH0377
    (HB1069)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0691Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding RequirementSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0940 / CH0214Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for RelocationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.