Children (O4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0067 / CH0089Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - CompositionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0329 / CH0184
    (SB0312 / CH0183)
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and PenaltiesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668 / CH0684
    (SB0584 / CH0683)
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State FundingDelegate RosenbergEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0772
    (SB0262)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1095
    (SB0369 / CH0067)
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate PlattVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1391Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1402 / CH0032
    (SB1125)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActDelegate McIntoshEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1424Regulation of Youth Sports - Ice Hockey Clubs - Noncontact LeagueDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1465Foster Care - Standards for Foster ParentsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1501Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators ProgramDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0079 / CH0045State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case InformationChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0102Governor's Office for Children and Services to ChildrenChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) AdoptedFinance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0262
    (HB0772)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0312 / CH0183
    (HB0329 / CH0184)
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and PenaltiesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0369 / CH0067
    (HB1095)
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0584 / CH0683
    (HB0668 / CH0684)
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State FundingSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB1125
    (HB1402 / CH0032)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.