Children (O4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0273
    (SB1161)
Education - Summer Meals Expansion Grant Program - EstablishedDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0395
    (SB0293 / CH0740)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportDelegate KellyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0416
    (SB0442)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB0418 / CH0209
    (SB0294 / CH0210)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0456 / CH0713
    (SB0943 / CH0714)
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution ProcessDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 713Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 / CH0025
    (SB0581 / CH0779)
Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-OldsDelegate AtterbearyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0697
    (SB0945)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0968Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and SignageDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1123Education - Prekindergarten - Program ApplicationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1130Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Online RegistrationDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1207 / CH0492
    (SB0085 / CH0491)
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - SiblingsDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1319Child Care Centers - Operating Without a License - PenaltiesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1330Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1551 / CH0456Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0085 / CH0491
    (HB1207 / CH0492)
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - SiblingsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 491Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0293 / CH0740
    (HB0395)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 740Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0294 / CH0210
    (HB0418 / CH0209)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 210Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0442
    (HB0416)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0581 / CH0779
    (HB0516 / CH0025)
Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-OldsSenator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0943 / CH0714
    (HB0456 / CH0713)
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution ProcessSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 714Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0945
    (HB0697)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Judicial Proceedings
SB1161
    (HB0273)
Education - Summer Meals Expansion Grant Program - EstablishedSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.