State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0026
    (SB0151)
Administrative Procedure Act - Fiscal Impact Statements for Proposed RegulationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0041Maryland Indian Status - Standards for RecognitionDelegate MurphyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0046
    (SB0275)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0053 / CH0584Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - RequiredDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0166
    (SB0449)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0168 / CH0588Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Boards, Commissions, and Councils - Member RemovalDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Finance
HB0193
    (SB0027)
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact AnalysisDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0207 / CH0589State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building CouncilChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0658 / CH0102Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government - Study on Appeals Under the Maryland Public Information ActDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0737State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy AnalysesDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0864State Lottery Agency - Veterans Lottery - EstablishedDelegate BotelerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0969 / CH0104General Provisions - Cross-References and CorrectionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1050State Occupational or Professional Licenses - Issuance to Undocumented Immigrants - ProhibitedDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Health and Government Operations
HB1151
    (SB0738)
Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1260
    (SB0644 / CH0069)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1447
    (SB0934)
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business ParticipationDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0027
    (HB0193)
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact AnalysisSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0142Inspection of Public Records - Internal Investigations Division of the Baltimore Police DepartmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0151
    (HB0026)
Administrative Procedure Act - Fiscal Impact Statements for Proposed RegulationsSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0275
    (HB0046)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0449
    (HB0166)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0644 / CH0069
    (HB1260)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0738
    (HB1151)
Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0934
    (HB1447)
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business ParticipationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.