State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0083
    (SB0444 / CH0350)
Public Records - InspectionDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0084 / CH0398Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - InterpretationDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0162
    (SB0611)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0264Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0305Administrative Procedure Act - Limitation on Adoption of RegulationsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0353
    (SB0094 / CH0149)
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services CostsDelegate CullisonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0674 / CH0266
    (SB0852)
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit RepresentativesDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0867Public Information Act - State Public Information Act Compliance Board and State PolicyDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB0977
    (SB0779)
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of ProceedingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0989
    (SB0713)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1251General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required TrainingDelegate Miller, W.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0094 / CH0149
    (HB0353)
State Government - Automated Mapping-Geographic Information Systems - System Services CostsSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0444 / CH0350
    (HB0083)
Public Records - InspectionSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0611
    (HB0162)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0695 / CH0135
    (HB0755 / CH0136)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0775
    (HB0939 / CH0137)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0779
    (HB0977)
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of ProceedingSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0852
    (HB0674 / CH0266)
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit RepresentativesSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0854State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.