State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0250
    (SB0528)
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of ComplianceDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0402
    (SB0671)
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public EmployeesDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0413 / CH0265Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video StreamingDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0492
    (SB0155)
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0823
    (SB0598)
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0984 / CH0330
    (SB0017 / CH0329)
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - RevisionDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1088
    (SB0754)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Enforcement, and TrainingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1105 / CH0132Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1193
    (SB0067)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate PlattIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1280
    (SB0599)
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1413State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1495
    (SB0942 / CH0704)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewDelegate CullisonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1584Open Meetings Act - Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland - Closed SessionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1631
    (SB1168)
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying AdoptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 / CH0329
    (HB0984 / CH0330)
Open Meetings Act - Retention of Minutes and Recordings - RevisionSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0067
    (HB1193)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0155
    (HB0492)
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0528
    (HB0250)
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of ComplianceSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0598
    (HB0823)
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Enforcement and TrainingSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0599
    (HB1280)
AELR Committee - Renaming and Regulatory Adoption ProceduresSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0671
    (HB0402)
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public EmployeesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0754
    (HB1088)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Enforcement, and TrainingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0930
    (HB0947)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0942 / CH0704
    (HB1495)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB1096Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or NeglectSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB1168
    (HB1631)
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying AdoptionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.