State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0027Open Meetings Act - Minutes - Required Internet PostingsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0078 / CH0552
    (SB0516)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Delegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0104Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - LiensChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0131State Planning - Central DepositoryChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0165 / CH0553
    (SB0137 / CH0554)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0383
    (SB1057 / CH0360)
Public Information Act - Denials of Inspection - Explanation Regarding RedactionDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0587 / CH0708
    (SB1084 / CH0709)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 708Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0620State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0668Health Occupations Boards - Regulations and Policy Interpretations - Notice and Public Meeting RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0698
    (SB0362)
Public Information Act - Records Relating to Alleged Job-Related Misconduct by Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0701Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for ProposalsDelegate KrimmIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0767
    (SB0970)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939
    (SB0747)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1142Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1241Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - RequirementsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1290State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air QualityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1471Business Occupations and Professions and Health Occupations - Regulation of Occupational BoardsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB1503Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - ReportsDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1553 / CH0722
    (SB1075)
Nonprofit Health Entity - Acquisition - Waiver of Waiting PeriodDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 722Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0137 / CH0554
    (HB0165 / CH0553)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0362
    (HB0698)
Public Information Act - Records Relating to Alleged Job-Related Misconduct by Law Enforcement OfficersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0450 / CH0526
    (HB0880 / CH0525)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0516
    (HB0078 / CH0552)
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)Senator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0747
    (HB0939)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0970
    (HB0767)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1057 / CH0360
    (HB0383)
Public Information Act - Denials of Inspection - Explanation Regarding RedactionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1075
    (HB1553 / CH0722)
Nonprofit Health Entity - Acquisition - Waiver of Waiting PeriodSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:49 A.M.