State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0048Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - RepealDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0167State Government - Notices and Communications - Use of Electronic MeansChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0387
    (SB0167)
Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB0603
    (SB1033)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0677 / CH0039
    (SB0477 / CH0040)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0695 / CH0304Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - CybersecurityDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0986
    (SB1009)
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1173Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - ReportsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1281State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public AccessDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
HB1623
    (SB0929)
State Policies, Guidelines, and Regulations - Mitigation of Disparate ImpactsDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1626Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal InformationDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1816
    (SB1257)
Safe Schools Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1828Address Confidentiality Programs - Obtaining or Disclosing Protected Information - Prohibitions and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0167
    (HB0387)
Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - ProhibitionSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0414 / CH0455Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data CollectionSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0477 / CH0040
    (HB0677 / CH0039)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0929
    (HB1623)
State Policies, Guidelines, and Regulations - Mitigation of Disparate ImpactsSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0984General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive CouncilSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1009
    (HB0986)
Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1033
    (HB0603)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1054Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public RecordSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1257
    (HB1816)
Safe Schools Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:20 P.M.