State Government - Personnel (P4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0136 / CH0083State Personnel - Teleworking - Statewide Program and GoalsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0183
    (SB0441 / CH0055)
Correctional Training Commission - MembersDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0185
    (SB0843)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Delegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0258
    (SB0800)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0391
    (SB0224 / CH0208)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0665 / CH0131State Personnel - Law Enforcement Employees - Extra CompensationDelegate DeBoyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0790State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch EmployeesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0893
    (SB0759)
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0941 / CH0656
    (SB0770)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1213
    (SB0724)
State Personnel - Program to Improve Employee to Supervisor Ratio and Employee Span of Control Review BoardDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1280
    (SB0677)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1335Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - RequirementDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1363State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable ServiceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1518Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's OfficeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 / CH0160State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records ChecksSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0012 / CH0163Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed ForcesSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0224 / CH0208
    (HB0391)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0329State Personnel - Hiring Preferences for Graduates of Public Institutions of Higher EducationSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0441 / CH0055
    (HB0183)
Correctional Training Commission - MembersSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0668Labor and Employment - Right to WorkSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0677
    (HB1280)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthoritySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0724
    (HB1213)
State Personnel - Program to Improve Employee to Supervisor Ratio and Employee Span of Control Review BoardSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0759
    (HB0893)
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0770
    (HB0941 / CH0656)
Criminal Law - Fraudulent Liens - ProhibitionSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0800
    (HB0258)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0843
    (HB0185)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.