State Government - Personnel (P4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0004Maryland Wage and Hour Law - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0030Frederick County Public Charter School Program - EstablishmentDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and Means
HB0046 / CH0395Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - RevisionsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0158 / CH0403
    (SB0243)
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0229
    (SB0604 / CH0043)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0346 / CH0414Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to MagistrateDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
HB0478Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0564 / CH0435State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0702
    (SB0657)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0718State Personnel - Innovative Idea Awards Program - Additional Cash AwardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0776
    (SB0687)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0977
    (SB0779)
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of ProceedingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0985Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - EstablishmentDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1072
    (SB0784)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0243
    (HB0158 / CH0403)
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0342State Employees - Fairness in Financial Disclosures ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0604 / CH0043
    (HB0229)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0657
    (HB0702)
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager RatiosSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0687
    (HB0776)
State Personnel - Parental LeaveSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0779
    (HB0977)
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Investigatory File and Record of ProceedingSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784
    (HB1072)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0793 / CH0199State Personnel - Automatic Step Increases - Standard Pay PlanSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0915State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services ProvidersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.