State Government - Personnel (P4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0164 / CH0098State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current EmployeesChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0194
    (SB0195 / CH0053)
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0401
    (SB0994)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0454 / CH0037
    (SB0378 / CH0023)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalarySpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0533State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0597
    (SB0021)
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - TeachersDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0795Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0909Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0910State Personnel - Innovative Idea Awards Program - Additional Cash AwardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0928 / CH0524
    (SB0818 / CH0523)
State Personnel - Individuals With Disabilities - Hiring PreferencesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1038Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1104
    (SB0689)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1190
    (SB0894)
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload AnalysisDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1293Labor and Employment - Break Time for Expression of Breast Milk by Employees - RequirementDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1372
    (SB0940)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1495
    (SB0942 / CH0704)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewDelegate CullisonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1536
    (SB1063 / CH0463)
Maryland Institute for Policy Analysis and Research Positions - Transfer to State Personnel Management SystemDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0021
    (HB0597)
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - TeachersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0195 / CH0053
    (HB0194)
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Finance
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378 / CH0023
    (HB0454 / CH0037)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalaryPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0447Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0619State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0689
    (HB1104)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0690State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive RepresentativesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0818 / CH0523
    (HB0928 / CH0524)
State Personnel - Individuals With Disabilities - Hiring PreferencesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0894
    (HB1190)
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - StudySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnFinance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0940
    (HB1372)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip CreditSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0942 / CH0704
    (HB1495)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial ReviewSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0994
    (HB0401)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB1063 / CH0463
    (HB1536)
Maryland Institute for Policy Analysis and Research Positions - Transfer to State Personnel Management SystemSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.