State Government - Personnel (P4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0001
    (SB0230)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0065Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0239
    (SB0291 / CH0015)
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0324
    (SB0580)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveDelegate KormanIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0450
    (SB0568)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0457 / CH0134
    (SB0347 / CH0135)
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0491
    (SB0446)
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive RepresentativesDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0499
    (SB0874)
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0614
    (SB0483)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0776
    (SB0757)
State Personnel - Department of State Police - Forensic Scientist SalariesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0991
    (SB0382 / CH0280)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1144
    (SB1031)
Payroll Recovery ActDelegate JonesIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1145Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1161
    (SB0921)
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional ServicesDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1250Higher Education - Student Employees - Collective BargainingDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1305Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum WageDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1416
    (SB0962)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1466 / CH0179State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Noncompetitive AppointmentDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1617State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0230
    (HB0001)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0291 / CH0015
    (HB0239)
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0347 / CH0135
    (HB0457 / CH0134)
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of PersonnelCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0382 / CH0280
    (HB0991)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite OrganizationsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0446
    (HB0491)
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive RepresentativesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0483
    (HB0614)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0490Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work ActSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0568
    (HB0450)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance RequirementsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0580
    (HB0324)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0627State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0661State Personnel - Contractual Employees - Transfer to Budgeted or Permanent PositionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0757
    (HB0776)
State Personnel - Department of State Police - Forensic Scientist SalariesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0772Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation LevelsSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0874
    (HB0499)
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0921
    (HB1161)
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional ServicesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0939State Personnel - Executive Branch Appointments by Department Secretaries - Procedures for RemovalSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0962
    (HB1416)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1031
    (HB1144)
Payroll Recovery ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (33-14)Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:57 P.M.