State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0142General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - ProhibitedDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0209
    (SB0238 / CH0212)
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/7/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0222General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial InterestsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0363Tax Increases - Majority Vote RequiredDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0381
    (SB0495)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeDelegate TarrantIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
HB0468State Government - Repeat Audit Findings - Report of Corrective ActionsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0516Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0568General Assembly - Members - Constituent Services FundDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0731Capital Projects - Eliminating Individual Bond BillsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0867General Assembly - Use of Public Resources - Ballot IssuesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1227General Assembly - Appointment to Vacancy in Office - ProcedureDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB1348 / CH0680Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and ClarificationsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0002Ongoing Conflict in the Democratic Republic of the CongoDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HS0001In Re: Delegate William "Tony" McConkey Resolution of ReprimandSpeakerIn the House - Adopted (127-3)
SB0238 / CH0212
    (HB0209)
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0283 / CH0042Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0284 / CH0043Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0495
    (HB0381)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledRules
SB0545Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0695Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0713Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st CenturySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0727Members of the General Assembly - Whistleblower ProtectionSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0839General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper UseSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0869Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and BeveragesSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SJ0002U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt IncreasesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.