State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0124General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial InterestsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0164General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0177General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0233Tax Increases - Super Majority Vote RequiredDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0698Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0734General Assembly - Removal of Members - IncarcerationDelegate DwyerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0813 / CH0427
    (SB0795)
Joint Committee on Ending HomelessnessDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0915
    (SB0740)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0969 / CH0104General Provisions - Cross-References and CorrectionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0970General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0999 / CH0106Code Revision - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1002Public Ethics - Former Officials and Employees - Lobbying RestrictionsDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1176Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and BoundariesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1179Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying RestrictionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1195General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1213Maryland Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1217Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1260
    (SB0644 / CH0069)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0001General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations - Employees' Pension SystemDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0002
    (SJ0001 / JR0003)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsRules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0004United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and ApportionmentDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0009
    (SJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsDelegate KachIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0011Commemoration of World Autism Awareness DayDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
HJ0012General Assembly Compensation Commission - Rejection of RecommendationsDelegate VitaleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0183 / CH0044Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
SB0184 / CH0045Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
SB0414General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0421General Assembly - Housing Allowance - Restriction on UseSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0644 / CH0069
    (HB1260)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0795
    (HB0813 / CH0427)
Joint Committee on Ending HomelessnessSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0845General Assembly - Rewards Earned Through Use of Housing Allowance - Prohibition on AcceptanceSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1115Members of the General Assembly - Responsibilities and Eligibility to VoteSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator FroshSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
SJ0002Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War IISenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0005Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Addition of "Under God" to the Pledge of AllegianceSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0009
    (HJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.