State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
HB0604
    (SB0166)
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0610Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0678
    (SB0478)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0806General Assembly - Vacancies - Special ElectionsDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1070General Assembly - Filling of VacancyDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and Means
HJ0001Number and Terms of United States Supreme Court JusticesDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0008
    (SJ0003)
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War IIDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0043State Government - Governor - Approval of Duplicative BillsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0099Congressional Districting ProcessSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0161General Assembly - Legislators' Right to Vote ActSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0166
    (HB0604)
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0222 / CH0021Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0223 / CH0022Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0478
    (HB0678)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0814Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0836General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by GovernorSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SJ0003
    (HJ0008)
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War IISenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.