State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0130Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)Delegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0168
    (SB0576)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0308Department of Legislative Services - Office of Information Systems - Video and Audio RecordingsDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0316General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0352 / CH0261Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System AuditsDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0411 / CH0104General Assembly - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - MembershipDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1209General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1370General Assembly - Limitation on Introduction of BillsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
HJ0003
    (SJ0004)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0004
    (SJ0003)
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting ReformDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0006
    (SJ0005)
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - RepealDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0375
    (HB0449)
Relief From Budget MandatesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0467General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0474Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0506 / CH0008Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0507 / CH0009Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0576
    (HB0168)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
SB0628General Assembly Standing Committees - Recorded Votes and Written TestimonySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0003
    (HJ0004)
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting ReformSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0004
    (HJ0003)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0005
    (HJ0006)
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.