State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0048Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - RepealDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0244 / CH0071
    (SB0680 / CH0072)
General Assembly – Prefiled Bills – DeadlinesDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0307General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0347
    (SB0294)
Government Accountability Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0348
    (SB0293)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0352
    (SB0295)
Transparency Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0561
    (SB1099 / CH0753)
Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police DepartmentDelegate McCrayIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0571General Assembly - Lactation Room - RequiredDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0704General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0731General Assembly - Length of SessionDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0874 / CH0281
    (SB0892)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
HB0886General Assembly - Term LimitsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1328General Assembly - Establishment of House Districts (Maryland Fair Representation Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1342 / CH0525
    (SB1138)
State Government – Discrimination and HarassmentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 p.m.
HJ0006
    (SJ0008)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HJ0008 / JR0001
    (SJ0006 / JR0002)
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick DouglassDelegate MautzSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0293
    (HB0348)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0294
    (HB0347)
Government Accountability Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0295
    (HB0352)
Transparency Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0592Joint Committee on Election Oversight - EstablishmentSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0680 / CH0072
    (HB0244 / CH0071)
General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - DeadlinesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
SB0683General Assembly - Bills Altering Salaries of Elected Officials - Introduction DeadlineSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0811 / CH0011Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11RulesRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0812 / CH0012Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12RulesRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0892
    (HB0874 / CH0281)
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and DutiesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
SB1099 / CH0753
    (HB0561)
Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit ReviewSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 753Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/6/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
SB1138
    (HB1342 / CH0525)
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual HarassmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SJ0006 / JR0002
    (HJ0008 / JR0001)
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick DouglassSenator EckardtSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
SJ0008
    (HJ0006)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.