Taxes - Property (Q1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0223 / CH0390Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - ApplicabilityDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0227 / CH0527
    (SB0572 / CH0526)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal InterestDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0245Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land TrustDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
HB0434
    (SB0693)
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic FilingDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0446 / CH0599Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's FeesDelegate StukesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 599Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0486
    (SB0189)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0492Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special RatesDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0541
    (SB0474)
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - ExtensionGarrett County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0581
    (SB0457)
Property Tax Assessment Appeal Board - Member - SalaryDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0674
    (SB0634)
Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals ProcessDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0681
    (SB0354 / CH0492)
Maryland Renters Tax Credit ProgramDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0703Real Property Tax - Phased In Value - DefinitionDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0876 / CH0194
    (SB0736 / CH0193)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - CalculationDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0898
    (SB0872)
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - ExemptionDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0933
    (SB0179)
Baltimore City - Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of SaleDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0940Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0950 / CH0433Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt PropertyDelegate HoganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1041
    (SB0553)
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet DatabaseDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1129Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1252Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans and Surviving Spouses - Percentage of DisabilityDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1279
    (SB0627)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1402Agricultural Transfer Tax - Distribution to Mel Noland Woodland Incentives FundDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1523Property Tax Exemption - Dwelling House of Disabled Veteran or Surviving Spouse - Repeal of Domicile RequirementsDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0141 / CH0471Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental CitationsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0179
    (HB0933)
Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of SaleSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0189
    (HB0486)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0201Baltimore City - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Transfer to Newly Purchased DwellingSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0318Property Tax - Sunshine Tax Credit Act of 2014Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0354 / CH0492
    (HB0681)
Maryland Renters Tax Credit Program - Marketing CampaignSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0457
    (HB0581)
Property Tax Assessment Appeal Board - Member - SalarySenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0474
    (HB0541)
Garrett County - Enterprise Zone Property Tax Credit - ExtensionSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0553
    (HB1041)
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet DatabaseSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0572 / CH0526
    (HB0227 / CH0527)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal InterestSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0627
    (HB1279)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0634
    (HB0674)
Task Force to Review Property Tax Assessment Procedures and the Assessment Appeals ProcessSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0693
    (HB0434)
Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic FilingSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0736 / CH0193
    (HB0876 / CH0194)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - CalculationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0872
    (HB0898)
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - ExemptionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0903Tax Sales - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Temporary ProhibitionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.