Taxes - Property (Q1)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0149State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap ReductionDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0161Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0259Personal Property Tax - Maximum Rate - Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0335Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0366Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0446Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0497 / CH0253
    (SB0356)
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability CompanyDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0644Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and VeteransDelegate MetzgarIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0651Personal Property Reports - Exemption and AffidavitDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0690Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)Delegate KrimmIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0959Real Property Tax - Phased In Value - DefinitionDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0996
    (SB0375)
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - RepealDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1035 / CH0114
    (SB0439)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1144Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1177Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1275Property Tax - Homeowner's Tax Credit - Computation and EligibilityDelegate LongIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0197Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted BuildingsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0356
    (HB0497 / CH0253)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income HousingSenator McFaddenIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0375
    (HB0996)
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - RepealSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0439
    (HB1035 / CH0114)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0590
    (HB0480)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015PresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0698Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet DatabaseSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.