Taxes - Property (Q1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0069 / CH0473Personal Property Tax - Credit for New or Small BusinessDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0114Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation and EligibilityDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0123Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0135Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and AffidavitDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0170State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap ReductionDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0291Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0340 / CH0483Property Tax - Renters' Property Tax Relief ProgramDelegate TarlauApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0378 / CH0668
    (SB0322 / CH0667)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignDelegate TarlauEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0483Property Tax - Homeowner's Tax Credit - Computation and EligibilityDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0488 / CH0487Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - AppealsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0561Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016Delegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
HB0572Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
HB0762Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0833 / CH0373
    (SB0306 / CH0372)
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - CalculationDelegate EbersoleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0898 / CH0498Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and VeteransDelegate MetzgarApproved by the Governor - Chapter 498Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0970 / CH0566
    (SB0591 / CH0565)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1255
    (SB0843 / CH0582)
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset ProvisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1299 / CH0508
    (SB0673)
Property Tax - Crane Located on State Property - ExemptionDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1363 / CH0737Property Tax - Appeals - Provision of Information to TaxpayersDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1409
    (SB0263)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park LandDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1475Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and TaxationDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB1553
    (SB1066)
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development DistrictDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0076 / CH0156Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - ScheduleChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0115Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of PropertySenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0263
    (HB1409)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0306 / CH0372
    (HB0833 / CH0373)
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - CalculationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0322 / CH0667
    (HB0378 / CH0668)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignSenator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0456Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
SB0591 / CH0565
    (HB0970 / CH0566)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0673
    (HB1299 / CH0508)
Personal Property Tax - State Land - ExemptionSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0843 / CH0582
    (HB1255)
Tax Credits - EvaluationsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1043Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB1066
    (HB1553)
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development DistrictSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.