Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0201 / CH0354
    (SB0164)
Queen Anne's County - Property Tax Credit - Commercial Investment and Economic DevelopmentSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0335 / CH0574
    (SB0900 / CH0573)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0450 / CH0116Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Renovated, Upgraded, or Rehabilitated Property Ho. Co. 11-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0549
    (SB0145)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0551 / CH0489
    (SB0506 / CH0488)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0675 / CH0134Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0677 / CH0135Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0822
    (SB0656 / CH0516)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0856Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1054Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2013Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1136
    (SB0523)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1158Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1194
    (SB0947 / CH0077)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.Delegate ImpallariaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0145
    (HB0549)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0164
    (HB0201 / CH0354)
Queen Anne's County - Property Tax Credit - Commercial Investment and Economic DevelopmentSenator PipkinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0318Frederick County - Property Tax Credit to Offset Income Tax Revenues - EligibilitySenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0506 / CH0488
    (HB0551 / CH0489)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0523
    (HB1136)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0573County Property Tax - Personal Property RateSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0656 / CH0516
    (HB0822)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilitySenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0900 / CH0573
    (HB0335 / CH0574)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0947 / CH0077
    (HB1194)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.Senator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.