Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0069
    (SB0841)
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0123 / CH0068
    (SB0186)
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - ModificationDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0134 / CH0070Charles County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding BusinessesCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0184
    (SB0842)
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0257
    (SB0702 / CH0048)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB0335Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation AreaDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0507
    (SB0541 / CH0038)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - SupermarketsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0543 / CH0258
    (SB0355)
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary EntitiesDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0607Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0664
    (SB0886 / CH0055)
Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities)Frederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0681 / CH0267Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff - Report PG 417-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0792Property Tax Credit - Elderly HomeownersDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0879
    (SB0483)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0927Prince George's County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Percentage PG 422-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0935 / CH0289Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1164
    (SB0925 / CH0211)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development ProjectsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1171
    (SB0923)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1177Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1199Baltimore City - Renters Tax Credit ProgramDelegate CarterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1276Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0081Carroll County - Property Tax Credit - Buc's Pleasure ClubSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
SB0186
    (HB0123 / CH0068)
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - ModificationSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0226Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0355
    (HB0543 / CH0258)
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary EntitiesSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0483
    (HB0879)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability CompaniesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0507Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0541 / CH0038
    (HB0507)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - SupermarketsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0623Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled HomeownersSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0702 / CH0048
    (HB0257)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0841
    (HB0069)
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0842
    (HB0184)
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0886 / CH0055
    (HB0664)
Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities)Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0923
    (HB1171)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransWashington County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0925 / CH0211
    (HB1164)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development ProjectsWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.