Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0111
    (SB0105)
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of RevenueSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0114Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization DistrictsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0231 / CH0174Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - AlterationsDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0302 / CH0125
    (SB0389 / CH0126)
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce ZonesDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0342 / CH0129Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Extension MC 3-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0346 / CH0118Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers MC 1-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0566 / CH0131Howard County - Property Tax - Exemption for Personal Property of Business Located in Historic District Ho. Co. 10-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0571
    (SB0282 / CH0173)
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0572 / CH0137Howard County - Property Tax Credit for Commercial Real Property - Flood Damage Ho. Co. 9-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0640
    (SB0526)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Police OfficersDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0649 / CH0085
    (SB0569 / CH0084)
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding AreasCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0681
    (SB0592 / CH0693)
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum AssociationAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0695 / CH0096
    (SB0930 / CH0095)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0750Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0751Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0923 / CH0470Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions CenterAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1051
    (SB1021)
Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business EntitiesDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1257Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax RatePrince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1269 / CH0060
    (SB0251 / CH0059)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited IncomeAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1426Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1472
    (SB0985)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1561Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Property Used in Well ConstructionDelegate FrushIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1567Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1573 / CH0819Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0105
    (HB0111)
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of RevenueSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0251 / CH0059
    (HB1269 / CH0060)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited IncomeSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0282 / CH0173
    (HB0571)
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - AlterationsSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389 / CH0126
    (HB0302 / CH0125)
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce ZonesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0526
    (HB0640)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersSenator FergusonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0569 / CH0084
    (HB0649 / CH0085)
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding AreasCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0592 / CH0693
    (HB0681)
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions CenterSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 693Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0930 / CH0095
    (HB0695 / CH0096)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsAnne Arundel County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0985
    (HB1472)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1021
    (HB1051)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017Senator ZuckerIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.