Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0052
    (SB0704)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0058Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College TextbooksDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0147Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0151Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness EquipmentDelegate Miller, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0232 / CH0609Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Parent-Teacher Organization FundraisersDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0511Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - ExemptionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0666Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School SuppliesDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1162Sales and Use Tax - Luxury SurchargeDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1210Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - MarinasSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1214Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - ApplicationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1277Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1487Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0022Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and StairliftsSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0653Sales and Use Tax - Mass TransitSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0704
    (HB0052)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0830Transportation Financing ActSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.