Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0030Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0056Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and TextbooksDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0063Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College TextbooksDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0347
    (SB0365)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0415Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition and Firearms - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0429Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School SuppliesDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0784
    (SB0732)
Income Tax Credit - Emergency Backup GeneratorsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0786 / CH0424
    (SB0417)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) LightsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0862Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1408Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - FundingDelegate WoodIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1515Sales and Use Tax - Definition of Taxable PriceDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1520Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsDelegate ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0009Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans Organizations That Sell Marine Corps UniformsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0365
    (HB0347)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0386Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and StairliftsSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0417
    (HB0786 / CH0424)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) LightsSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0732
    (HB0784)
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.