Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0261
    (SB0574)
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - ExemptionDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0594Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0726Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0875
    (SB0665)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0903Sales and Use Tax - Exemption for Precious Metal Bullion and Coins - RepealDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0928Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of ExemptionDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0958
    (SB0447)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0964Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - ApplicationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1065
    (SB0190)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1233
    (SB0763 / CH0050)
Tax Amnesty ProgramDelegate WalkerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0190
    (HB1065)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0447
    (HB0958)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0574
    (HB0261)
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - ExemptionSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0665
    (HB0875)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0763 / CH0050
    (HB1233)
Tax Amnesty ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0789Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library ServicesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.