Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0165Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - RatesDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0267Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Out-of-State VendorsDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0313
    (SB0014)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionDelegate SaabIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0405
    (SB0018)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners AssociationDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0540Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Trade-Ins and Core ChargesDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0544Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0598Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax RevenuesDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0694Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0719
    (SB0522)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0784Sales and Use Tax - Baby Diapers - ExemptionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0807Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0861Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and TaxationDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0932Sales and Use Tax - Casual and Isolated Sales - Exemption AmountDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1271
    (SB0351)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety DevicesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1279Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy Consumption by RestaurantsDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1315Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Nonprofit Organizations Raising Funds to Assist VeteransDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1321Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth Headset or Hands-Free DeviceDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1361
    (SB0776)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1510
    (SB0904)
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
HB1533 / CH0604
    (SB1062 / CH0603)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0014
    (HB0313)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0018
    (HB0405)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners AssociationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0062Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Emergency Preparedness EquipmentSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0220Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate ReductionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0351
    (HB1271)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety DevicesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0454Sales and Use Tax - Manufacturing Businesses - Exemption for Energy CostsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0511Taxes - Sales and Use Tax - RepealSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0522
    (HB0719)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0659Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0776
    (HB1361)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0904
    (HB1510)
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1062 / CH0603
    (HB1533 / CH0604)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1103Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.