Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0053Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Firearm Safety DevicesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
HB0067
    (SB0159)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
HB0095Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0113Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - DefinitionDelegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
HB0223Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Electricity Consumption by Small Business Located in Qualified Distressed CountyDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0424
    (SB0304)
Taxpayer Protection ActSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0470
    (SB0235)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Service Performed by Person Practicing EngineeringDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0530
    (SB0622)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and BookbagsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0657Cannabis - Use of State RevenuesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0713Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0728Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - ExtensionDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0796
    (SB0748)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0922
    (SB1132)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Nonprofit Organizations Raising Funds to Assist VeteransDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1112
    (SB0720)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural PurposesDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1186
    (SB0927)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1213
    (SB0855)
Main Street Fairness Act of 2017Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1242Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Bluetooth Headset or Hands-Free DeviceDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1245
    (SB0052)
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1337Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1618
    (SB1143)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic DistrictsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0052
    (HB1245)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and CondomsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0157Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate ReductionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0159
    (HB0067)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0235
    (HB0470)
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - ServicesSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0304
    (HB0424)
Taxpayer Protection ActPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0622
    (HB0530)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and BookbagsSenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0720
    (HB1112)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural PurposesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0748
    (HB0796)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0855
    (HB1213)
Main Street Fairness Act of 2017Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0927
    (HB1186)
Excise Tax and Sales Tax - CannabisSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB1073Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of RestaurantsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1132
    (HB0922)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Sales by Nonprofit Organizations Raising Funds to Assist VeteransSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1143
    (HB1618)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Ellicott City and Ellicott's Mills Historic DistrictsSenator BatesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

March 27, 2017 8:22 P.M.