Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0066Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Rate ReductionDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0272Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0318
    (SB0212)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionDelegate SaabIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0345Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - ExemptionDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0363
    (SB0305)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0671 / CH0466
    (SB0467)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Classroom Supplies Purchased by TeachersDelegate PattersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0754Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Target Redevelopment Area – Washington CountyDelegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0820Sales and Use Tax - Replacement Boat Motors - ExemptionDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0989
    (SB0877 / CH0350)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1264
    (SB1039)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1318
    (SB0663)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1521Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - BluetoothDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1664Sales and Use Tax - Casual and Isolated Sales - Exemption AmountDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0081 / CH0050Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - ExemptionChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0212
    (HB0318)
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0305
    (HB0363)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0457Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0467
    (HB0671 / CH0466)
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Classroom Supplies Purchased by TeachersSenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0663
    (HB1318)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0877 / CH0350
    (HB0989)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1025Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State VendorsSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1039
    (HB1264)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:21 P.M.