Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0668Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in County-Owned VehiclesDelegate HowardIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0682Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1210Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - MarinasSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0574Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in City- or County-Owned VehiclesSenator RobeyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0636Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In ValueSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0652Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit FundingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
SB0830Transportation Financing ActSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB1006Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited ActsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1013Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit FinancingSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.