Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0054Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price IndexDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0277Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
HB1345 / CH0360
    (SB0908 / CH0359)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Finance
SB0629Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee SurchargeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0908 / CH0359
    (HB1345 / CH0360)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.