Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0174Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0454
    (SB0664)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0774Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and Means
HB0899Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue - Local GovernmentsDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1003Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of RevenueDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0010Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0589
    (HB0483)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0664
    (HB0454)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.