Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0116Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0165Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - RatesDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0406
    (SB0870)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0756
    (SB0520 / CH0397)
Washington County - Board of Education - Motor Fuel Tax ExemptionWashington County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0986 / CH0728Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased VehiclesDelegate BeidleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1042Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased VehiclesDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1290Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate InformationDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1588Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response TripsDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0196Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0520 / CH0397
    (HB0756)
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and RefundWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0870
    (HB0406)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.