Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0957Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0177Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 ApplicantsSenator MannoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0363Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0606 / CH0700Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail FundSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 700Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:11 P.M.