Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0372 / CH0453
    (SB0202 / CH0452)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1236 / CH0532
    (SB0730 / CH0531)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling InterestDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0202 / CH0452
    (HB0372 / CH0453)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0436 / CH0267
    (HB1209 / CH0268)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0730 / CH0531
    (HB1236 / CH0532)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling InterestSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0994Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.