Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0595 / CH0233Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial InstitutionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0711Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds VoteDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1310Recordation Tax - Home Equity Loan Modifications - ExemptionDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0106 / CH0129Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - ExemptionChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.