Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0010Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0044Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanyDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0447 / CH0621Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit CourtCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1085Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1226 / CH0224
    (SB0597 / CH0223)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1464
    (SB0927)
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016Delegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0597 / CH0223
    (HB1226 / CH0224)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0927
    (HB1464)
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.