Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0223 / CH0138Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0620 / CH0294County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - ExtensionsDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0948 / CH0316Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and FeesDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0372 / CH0315Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and FeesSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0999 / CH0594Recordation Tax - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 3:56 P.M.