Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0034Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of LimitationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0184Estate and Inheritance Taxes - RepealDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0186Estate Tax - Recoupling With Federal LawDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0188
    (SB0155)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0276Estate Tax - Qualified Family-Owned Business Interests - ExclusionDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0351Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0443
    (SB0589)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0525Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture ProvisionsDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0554
    (SB0625)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0686
    (SB0423)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0739 / CH0612
    (SB0602)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1085Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - RepealDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1214Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion AmountDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1492Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0039Back Taxes - No Penalty, No InterestSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0155
    (HB0188)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0163Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion AmountSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0244Inheritance Tax - RepealSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0324Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0423
    (HB0686)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0535Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0589
    (HB0443)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
SB0601 / CH0532
    (HB0741 / CH0533)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0602
    (HB0739 / CH0612)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0625
    (HB0554)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0892Maryland Estate Tax - Transfer of Qualified Agricultural Property by a Qualified RecipientSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1011Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion AmountSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.