Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0122Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small BusinessesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0148Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0221
    (SB0073)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0290 / CH0236Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance RestrictionsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0291 / CH0237Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shippers - Reporting RequirementsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0333Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0676
    (SB0002)
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit ProgramDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0723Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - RepealDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0730Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0768Tax Procedure - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and Means
HB0826
    (SB0178 / CH0018)
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty ProhibitionDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0827 / CH0282Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue DistributionDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0828 / CH0104
    (SB0177)
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax ReturnsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0991Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1233
    (SB0763 / CH0050)
Tax Amnesty ProgramDelegate WalkerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0004Moratorium on Taxes and RegulationsDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0002
    (HB0676)
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit ProgramSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0073
    (HB0221)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0177
    (HB0828 / CH0104)
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax ReturnsSenator KasemeyerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0178 / CH0018
    (HB0826)
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty ProhibitionSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0265 / CH0334Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0661Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0707 / CH0049Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due DateSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0763 / CH0050
    (HB1233)
Tax Amnesty ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.