Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0014 / CH0657
    (SB0058 / CH0656)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of TerminationDelegate KipkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0071
    (SB0514)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0139
    (SB0320)
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - RateDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0422 / CH0322Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0451
    (SB0377 / CH0145)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts CouncilSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0522Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0648 / CH0422
    (SB0757 / CH0421)
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Electronic Filing of ReturnsDelegate MoonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0729Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0789Tax Procedure - Assessments, Penalties, and Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1206Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and RatesDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1251
    (SB0844)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1255
    (SB0843 / CH0582)
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset ProvisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1361
    (SB0776)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0058 / CH0656
    (HB0014 / CH0657)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of TerminationSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0286Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0292Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for RefundSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0320
    (HB0139)
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - RateSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0377 / CH0145
    (HB0451)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts CouncilPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 145Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
SB0514
    (HB0071)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0757 / CH0421
    (HB0648 / CH0422)
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Electronic Filing of ReturnsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
SB0776
    (HB1361)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0843 / CH0582
    (HB1255)
Tax Credits - EvaluationsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0844
    (HB1251)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0847Estate Tax - Exclusion AmountPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1089Inheritance Tax - Exemption - CousinsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.