Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0094 / CH0258Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Requirements for Matching FundsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0112 / CH0506Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - RoundingDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0424
    (SB0304 / CH0379)
Taxpayer Protection ActSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0463Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0842Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field TripsDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0935
    (SB0093)
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection RequirementDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1104 / CH0503
    (SB0276)
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic PartnershipDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1331Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax RepealDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0093
    (HB0935)
Hotel Rental Tax - Accommodations Intermediary - Collection RequirementSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0260Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0276
    (HB1104 / CH0503)
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic PartnershipSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0304 / CH0379
    (HB0424)
Taxpayer Protection ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0352Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding ExtensionCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0716Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural ProductsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.