Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0198 / CH0293Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – ExemptionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0308 / CH0021
    (SB0646 / CH0015)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditDelegate TarlauEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0964Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field TripsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1227Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - AlterationsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1352Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness (Maryland Taxpayer Protection Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1370
    (SB0956)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - EstablishmentDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1371Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - DistributionDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1374Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and NephewsDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1399
    (SB0833)
Task Force on the Regulation of CaterersDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1459 / CH0118Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1541
    (SB0994)
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit HospitalsDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1707Inheritance Tax - RepealDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0083 / CH0652Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return DeadlineChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0107Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting RequirementsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0428Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0561Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0565Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsSenator SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0646 / CH0015
    (HB0308 / CH0021)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0833
    (HB1399)
Imposition of Sales Tax on CaterersSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsFinance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0956
    (HB1370)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - EstablishmentSenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0961 / CH0420Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0980Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and NephewsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0994
    (HB1541)
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit HospitalsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:02 P.M.