Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0815
    (SB0631 / CH0510)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0913Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax RateDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1036Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on NonresidentsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0631 / CH0510
    (HB0815)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.